judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOWARD UNIVERSITY INC. HORTON, CHRISTANNA

Case Information: 86-CV-0092
Short Caption:HOWARD UNIVERSITY INC. HORTON, CHRISTANNAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Lead:86-CV-0092Consolidated: 86-CV-0176 , 86-CV-0249
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5284-83Filed Date:01/10/1986

Opening Event Date:01/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/21/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/28/1987
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John F. Mahoney YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Karl N. Marshall YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOWARD UNIVERSITY INC. HORTON, CHRISTANNA ET AL
01/01/1906 CC for: Arnold Evans, M.D. & DC
01/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/21/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/28/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/10/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/03/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition