judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN C. FORD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0170
Short Caption:KEVIN C. FORD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9536-85Filed Date:02/09/1987

Opening Event Date:02/09/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/23/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/29/1987
Argued/Submitted:02/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Bernard Jay Williams YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Glenn A. Fine YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FORD, KEVIN C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: TYRONE GRISSOM NOTE - 01
02/09/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 021987 SCHPRD CHECK
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD R
06/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (264 PGS - LEWIS) PB PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD RT
06/23/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/23/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD BA
08/18/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 29TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 082687 SCHPRD BE
09/29/1987FiledBriefing Completed
09/29/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 092987 SCHPRD BE
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (7 PGS - JOYNER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/09/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION/ CASE RM TO CORRECT CLERICAL/ ERROR IN WRITTEN SENTENCE PANELPYTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD