Case Information: 40932 | |||
Short Caption: | LAYMON (RAYMOND) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CVHC955375 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/03/2003 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/13/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 03-02522 | |
03/20/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential. See NRS 176.156(5).] | 03-04720 | |
07/03/2003 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1through 5. | 03-11223 | |
07/03/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/03/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to the relief requested and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn11[On October 30, 2003, this court received a proper person motion for leave to file papers, motions, and briefs. On November 6, 2003, this court received an opposition submitted by the State. We have considered all documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP04S-NB/MS/MG | 03-20118 | |
01/08/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP04S-MS/NB/MG | 04-00387 | |
02/03/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-00420 | |
02/03/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/12/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice, having died in office on January 9, 2004, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] EN BANC | 04-02739 | |
02/27/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2004. | 04-00420 |