judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0565
Short Caption:CHARLES E. PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0565Consolidated: 87-CF-1332
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5345-86Filed Date:05/15/1987

Opening Event Date:05/15/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/13/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/10/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Eric M. Acker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PARKER, CHARLES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: SYLVESTER J. LEWIS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 87-1332 & 89-847 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 3/7/89 ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 03 STAY PENDING DISPOSITION OF NOTE - 04 23-110 MO FL IN THE TRIAL CT NOTE - 04 & SERVE A COPY OF THE CT UPON NOTE - 05 DISPOSITION OF MO IN TRIAL CT NOTE - 05 FAILURE TO NOTIFY W/IN 5 DAYS NOTE - 06 OF DISPOSITION OF MO PENDING NOTE - 06 WILL BE CONSIDERED NON-COMPLI NOTE - 07 ANCE WITH THE GENERAL RULES OF NOTE - 07 THIS COURT.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APLT LEWIS ATTY 2 - LEEFERM FOR - APLT PARKER ATTY 3 - ACKERE FOR - APPELLEE
05/15/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 071487 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/12/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (65 PGS. - RUST) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 082087 SCHPRD CHECK
10/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JJ PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD OPE
12/07/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(264 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 103187 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 25TH (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
02/18/1988LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (4 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1ST (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD X
03/09/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, DATED 3/7/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988ORDER SS, CON 87-565 & 87-1332;BRF OF APLT IN 87-1332 DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE REC IS FL. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE APLT'S PRO SE LTR OF 3/7/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988RECEIVED COPY OF ORDER DATED 3/28/88 FROM JUDGE DIXON RE MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE, ETC MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT REQUESTING RESPONSE BY 4/27 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE RE: MEETING WITH APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD ANSA
05/02/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 4/27/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1988LETTER DATED 4/30/88 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1988LETTER LTR TO APLT RE: 5/3/88 LTR. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 6/23/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS 6/23/88 LETTER SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT RE APPOINTMENT OF NEW COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE LTR RECVD 7/21/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO LETTER DATED 8/4/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD ANS
08/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (39 PGS - WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988RECEIVED LTR FRM ATTY LEEFER RE: LTR DATED 8/4/88 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1989ORDER APLT BR IN 87-1332 DUE IN 40 DAY; CONS BR OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD R
02/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE PENDING 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT IN 87-1332 (APPELLANT) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 3-7 PB PANELRO SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD BA
04/13/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 87-1332 IN 15 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE STAT OF MO IN TR CT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/28/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 4/13/89 IN 87-1332 MLR PANEL SCDATE 042889 SCHPRD STATE
07/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 IN 87-1332 (MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN 87-1332 RE DISPOSITION OF 23-110 MOTION FILED IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (55 PGS. -- GLEASON) IN 87-1332 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT IN 87-1332 DUE IN 30 DAYS; CONS BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD X
08/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1332 TO SEPTEMBER 14, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1332 & 89-847 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-1332 & 89-847 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF OF APLT LEWIS IN 87-1332 & 89-847 MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT LEWIS TO FL BRF IN 87-1332 & 89-847; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. PANELRBH SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD M
12/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-25-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 122789 SCHPRD BE
01/18/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/25/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD M
01/25/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 1, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 012590 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/13/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD V
04/23/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/12/90 CITATION OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/10/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1991REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART & AFFIRMED IN PART IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OPINION. PANELTESTNW SCDATE 051090 SCHPRD RDEC
12/20/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -ST 601 A.2d 45
12/20/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 4059 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 4075
01/10/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD