judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JANET A. CARSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0611
Short Caption:JANET A. CARSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6361-85Filed Date:05/29/1987

Opening Event Date:05/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/17/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/19/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJanet A. Carson N
Edwin C. Brown, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John M. Seabright YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CARSON, JANET A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FE: CRUELTY TO CHILDREN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 6/25/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 02 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; NOTE - 03 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 03 RECORD TO THIS CRT W/OUT FEE NOTE - 04 FORTHWITH; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 NOTE - 04 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS FILED IN NOTE - 05 THIS CRT. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/04/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BROWNED FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SEABRIGHTJ FOR - APPELLEE
05/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/08/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062387 SCHPRD RBH
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
07/31/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 20, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090987 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (150 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
10/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD BA
10/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 102887 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 17, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 112087 SCHPRD CHECK
12/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (GOV. EXHIBITS 1-9 PHOTOS & 10-11 LETTERS IN SMALL BROWN ENVELOPE) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/17/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 121787 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 4/19/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/19/1988ARGUED PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELMKBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE 556 A.2d 1076
04/05/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0557 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 0000
04/26/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1989LETTER RETURNING EXHIBITS (PHOTOS) TO SUPERIOR COURT, APPEALS COORDINATOR JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1990LETTER RETURNING EXHIBITS-- ONE SMALL ENVELOPE OF EXHIBITS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD