judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUCHANAN (KENYON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44801
Short Caption:BUCHANAN (KENYON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204980Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/06/2007 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/06/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/03/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/03/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-04245
03/03/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/5/04, 11/30/04, 12/2/04, 12/3/04, 12/6/04, 12/7/04 and 1/13/05. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn, Jackie Nelson and Yvonne Valentin. Filed in district court on: February 28, 2005. 05-04246
03/07/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/05/04; 11/30/04; and 12/02/04.. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 05-04475
03/22/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/3/04. Court Reporter: Jackie Nelson. 05-05590
04/08/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-06972
04/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 8, 2005. The rough draft transcript requests were filed in the district court on February 28, 2005, and the requested transcripts are overdue. Court reporters or recorders Maureen Schorn and Yvonne Valentin shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 05-08048
05/10/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 12/6/04 and 12/7/04. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 05-09110
05/10/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/13/05. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 05-09111
05/26/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-10377
06/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 26, 2005. Counsel has not filed a copy of a rough draft transcript request form in this court as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3). If counsel for appellant filed a rough draft transcript request form in the district court, counsel for appellant is directed to file 2 copies of that rough draft transcript request form and proof of service as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3) in this court within 5 days of this order. If counsel for appellant did not file a rough draft transcript request form in the district court, counsel is ordered to file such a request form within 5 days of this order, and file 2 copies of the transcript request form and proof of service in this court within 10 days of this order. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the newly-requested transcript in which to file the fast track statement and appendix. 05-11019
06/13/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/02/04. Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: 05/24/05. 05-11605
07/13/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. 05-13943
07/18/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 27 Page Fast Track Statement. 05-14277
07/27/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 13, 2005 and July 18, 2005. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on July 18, 2005. 05-14854
07/27/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-14278
07/27/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-14279
08/16/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 26 Page Fast Track Response. 05-16204
09/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 16, 2005. The clerk shall file the 26-page fast track response provisionally submitted on August 16, 2005. 05-17501
09/06/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-16205
12/30/2005Order/Procedural Order. Transcript due from court reporter Joe D'Amato: 10 days or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 05-25413
12/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Opening brief due: 30 days. fn2[Should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcript or cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts.] 05-25414
01/13/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 2, 2004. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 06-00960
02/03/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 1, 2006. 06-02516
03/06/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 31 pages. 06-04893
03/06/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-04895
04/04/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-07072
05/05/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 5, 2006. 06-09451
06/07/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-11928
08/14/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion to file Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Issue II. 06-16919
08/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filing Supplemental Authorities. The clerk shall file the supplemental authorities received on August 14, 2006. 06-17658
08/25/2006BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondent's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Issue II. 06-16920
09/07/2006BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. State's Response to Appellant's Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Issue II. 06-18537
10/10/2006MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion to file Reply to Response to Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Issue II. 06-20751
11/02/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Reply to Response. The clerk shall file the "Reply to Response to Supplemental Points and Authorities" received on October 10, 2006. 06-22376
11/02/2006MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Response to Supplemental Points and Authorities in Support of Issue II. 06-20752
11/28/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 6, 2007, at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc)
01/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
02/06/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC.
02/08/2007MotionFiled Motion. to Supplement the Record and for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix. 07-03252
02/08/2007BriefReceived Supplemental Authorities. 07-03254
04/10/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Oral argument was heard in this appeal on February 6, 2007. Appellant has moved for leave to file supplemental points and authorities and a supplemental appendix. We direct the clerk to file the documents submitted by appellant on February 8, 2007. Respondent shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a responsive supplemental memorandum, if it deems such a response necessary. 07-07941
04/10/2007BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. 07-03254
04/10/2007AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 07-03258
06/22/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIMRED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC 07-13697
07/17/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-14189
07/17/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/24/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 19, 2007. 07-14189