judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARL L. GRIER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0571
Short Caption:EARL L. GRIER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 86-CF-0798 Consolidated:87-CF-0571
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4438-81Filed Date:04/30/1987

Opening Event Date:04/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/06/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/10/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarl L. Grier N
Robin L. Herman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRIER, EARL L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 (FE: ASSAULT WITH INTENT TO NOTE - 01 KILL WHILE ARMED) NOTE - 02 CON 86-798 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 6/10/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 03 TO DEEM PORTIONS OF RT ON NOS. NOTE - 04 82-273 & 83-1515 AS PART OF NOTE - 04 THE REC; GRANT MO OF APLE TO NOTE - 05 EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL NOTE - 05 BRF OF APLE & TO SCHED CASE NOTE - 06 FOR CONSID AS SOON AS BIZ OF NOTE - 06 CRT PERMITS.
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
07/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBIN HERMAN, ESQ. (SEE 86-798) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 86-798 & 87-571 AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE GG PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD BA
05/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD R
07/06/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO CONS 86-798 & 87-571; CONS BR OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 061587 SCHPRD CHECK
09/15/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD BA
09/17/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PRIOR TRANS. TO BE CONSIDERED AS PART OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 19, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD BE
11/19/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/10/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD OPE
06/17/1988RECEIVED REQUEST FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE RE STATUS OF CASE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988LETTER TO APLT RE STATUS OF APPEAL SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1988SUBMITTED PANELRGMKRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGMKRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/01/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 1/6/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD