Case Information: 40933 | |||
Short Caption: | GRIFF (PRESTON) VS. YOUNG | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189125 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/13/2003 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus/or Mandate. | 03-02525 | |
03/03/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-03493 | |
04/09/2003 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-05975 | |
05/06/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 03-06229 | |
05/06/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/14/2003 | Other | Returned Mail. Notice in Lieu of Remittitur issued 05/06/03 addressed to Preston Griff returned. No forwarding address. |