Case Information: 44816 | |||
Short Caption: | BREMNER VS. INKWARE, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A456689 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/15/2005 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/07/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/07/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04421 | |
03/09/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/15/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/21/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-05506 | |
03/21/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on: 03/09/05. | 05-05509 | |
03/23/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Lester H. Berkson. (case appeal statement) | ||
03/31/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 05-06373 | |
05/10/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 05-09187 | |
05/20/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. | 05-09958 | |
06/20/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Settlement Status Report. | 05-12105 | |
12/28/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal within 15 days. Failure to comply with this order may result in this appeal being dismissed as abandoned. | 05-25313 | |
01/11/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Submitted by counsel for appellant regarding status of settlement. | 06-00701 | |
02/14/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 20 days to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or to otherwise inform this court of the status of the appeal. | 06-03208 | |
02/21/2006 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation Dismissing Appeal. | 06-03798 | |
02/27/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 06-04354 | |
02/27/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |