judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY R. FOSTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0661
Short Caption:ANTHONY R. FOSTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5902-86Filed Date:06/04/1987

Opening Event Date:06/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/06/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/31/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/18/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony R. Foster N
K. Duff Lewis YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOSTER, ANTHONY R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 090487 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED FO: NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO NOTE - 03 FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT, NOTE - 03 INDICATING ESTIMATED COMP DATE NOTE - 04 OF RT. NOTE - 04
06/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) K. DUFF LEWIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/06/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD R
08/12/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD BA
09/04/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD CHECK
10/22/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD STATE
12/11/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (204 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 13TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD N
02/08/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA
03/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 31ST (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BE
03/31/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/31/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD BE
10/18/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/18/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFETERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/14/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD