Case Information: 44818 | |||
Short Caption: | CANTU VS. HART | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D176138 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/07/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mathew Harter, Esq.--check no. 6139. | ||
03/07/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04432 | |
03/28/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-05975 | |
03/29/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days. | ||
04/01/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/26/05 and 02/16/05. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 05-06468 | |
04/22/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 01/26/05 and 02/16/05. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. | 05-07937 | |
06/13/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Child Custody Brief and Appendix. | ||
06/27/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-12660 | |
06/27/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 05-12661 | |
07/20/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Shea A. Backus. | 05-14374 | |
07/20/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-14375 | |
08/22/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We suspend briefing pending further order of this court. Fn4 [We defer ruling on respondent's July 20, 2005 motion for an extension of time in which to file an answering brief.] | 05-16582 | |
09/26/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause; Motion for Stay Pending Appeal; Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. | 05-19104 | |
10/05/2005 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | 05-19778 | |
10/07/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay. | 05-19887 | |
11/02/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Supplement to his Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay. | 05-21604 | |
11/28/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Since we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, " . . . we dismiss it." fn7[We deny as moot appellant's September 26, 2005 motion. We have received and considered appellant's October 20, 2005, proper person document. We deny as moot respondent's July 20, 2005 motion to extend time to file an answering brief, and direct the clerk to return, unfiled, respondent's answering brief provisionally received on July 27, 2005. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Cliff Young, Senior Justices, participated in the decision of this matter under general orders of assignment entered on July 14, and July 18, 2005.] NNP-SR-NB/MS/CY | 05-23190 | |
11/28/2005 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix, Volumes 1 and 2, received July 27, 2005, to the Backus Carranza firm. | ||
12/23/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-23444 | |
12/23/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/05/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2005. | 05-23444 |