judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS C. BARTLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0660
Short Caption:THOMAS C. BARTLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 87-CF-0563 Consolidated:87-CF-0660
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9888-86Filed Date:06/04/1987

Opening Event Date:06/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/08/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas C. Bartley N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven W. Pelak YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BARTLEY, THOMAS C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES J. YOUNG NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 87-563 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 081088 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 03 TO CONS 87-563 & 87-660; FO: NOTE - 04 APLT BR IN 87-563 DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 04 AFT RT & CONS BR OF APLE DUE NOTE - 05 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 05
06/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD R
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 081487 SCHPRD CHECK
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/04/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (529 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 092587 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/5/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 070788 SCHPRD V
08/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(26 PGS/MOORE) IN 87-563 AD PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD CHECK
01/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-563 TO MARCH 3, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD BA
02/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-563 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/3/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-563 JB PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD BA
04/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 8, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD BE
04/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/8/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD CHECK
05/08/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BE
11/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990RECEIVED APLE'S OPPO TO MOTION TO VACATE & RE-ENTER JUDGEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO VACATE AND RE-ENTER JUDGMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO VACATE AND RE-ENTER JUDGMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO VACATE & REENTER JUDGMENT. DAS PANELNWSCMK SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD VS