Case Information: 44820 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON VS. JOHNSON & JOHNSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A428759 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/15/2005 / Holland Johnson, Susan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/10/2006 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/07/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alan S. Levin, P.C.--check 1008. | ||
03/07/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04459 | |
03/15/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/29/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Docketing Statement). | ||
04/04/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-06511 | |
04/18/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 05-07474 | |
06/03/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 05-10982 | |
06/14/2005 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 05-11626 | |
06/16/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/02/05. To Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. | 05-11803 | |
07/01/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondents' Certificate of No Additionally Ordered Transcripts. | 05-13129 | |
08/12/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, Mr. Kangas has not filed the requested transcript. Mr. Kangas shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Mr. Kangas shall within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Mr. Kangas shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. Fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | 05-15974 | |
08/22/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: March 2, 2005. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. | 05-16650 | |
09/12/2005 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 6. | 05-17977 | |
09/12/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-17979 | |
09/26/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 05-19087 | |
09/27/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 05-19166 | |
09/30/2005 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. as Moot filed September 27, 2005. This court entered an order suspending the briefing schedule. The parties' stipulation to extend the time for filing the answering brief is disapproved as moot. | 05-19494 | |
10/19/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 05-20664 | |
11/10/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response from counsel for appellant due: 30 days. The briefing schedule shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 05-22231 | |
12/09/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Reply to Second Order to Show Cause. | 05-24125 | |
12/16/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to Supplement Exhibits in Appellants Reply to Second Order to Show Cause. | 05-24526 | |
12/28/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. fn1[We direct the clerk to amend the caption on this court's docket to conform to the caption on this order. The parties shall have 10 days to notify us if the caption is inaccurate.] We conclude that the district court has entered a final, appealable order, and this appeal may proceed and we reinstate the briefing schedule. Answering briefs due: 30 days. fn4[We grant appellant's unopposed motion to supplement her December 9, 2005 response with the district court orders dismissing the remaining parties.] | 05-25258 | |
01/30/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 06-02197 | |
02/28/2006 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 06-04572 | |
07/10/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 06-14148 | |
07/10/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP06-WM/MG/JH | ||
07/12/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-14310 | |
08/08/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-16251 | |
08/08/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/17/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 10, 2006. | 06-16251 |