judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENISE THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0664
Short Caption:DENISE THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7412-86Filed Date:05/28/1987

Opening Event Date:05/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDenise Thomas N
Thurman Haywood Rhodes NN
AppellantDenise Thomas N
John Wesley Days NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Steven Weinberg NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
W. Mark Nebeker YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, DENISE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/12/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF THIRMAN H. RHODES & APPT NOTE - 02 STEVEN WEINBERG FOR APLT;NEW NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL STATE NOTE - 03 IN 10 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 04 SUPP BRF WILL BE FL ON BEHALF NOTE - 04 OF APLT.
01/01/1906 RHODEST VACATED 4/12/88. DAYSJ WITHDRAWN 11/25/87.
05/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THURMAN H. RHODES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/07/1987APPEARANCE OF JOHN WESLEY DAYS AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(MEMORANDUM) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090287 SCHPRD RT
10/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (168 PGS - MOLLICHELLI) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD BA
11/19/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF JOHN WESLEY DAYS AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D, JOHN WESLEY DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD DAS
12/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/20/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BE
01/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/20/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 012088 SCHPRD BE
04/01/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS T.H. RHODES, COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT & AP- POINT NEW COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1988ORDER SEE NOT FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD CHECK
04/22/1988STATEMENT OF APLT'S COUNSEL RE SUPPLE- MENTAL BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD STATE
05/18/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELNWBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/10/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD