judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUCINDA F. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1361
Short Caption:LUCINDA F. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6004-89Filed Date:11/09/1989

Opening Event Date:11/09/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/06/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLucinda F. Coleman N
Brian C. Plitt YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
J. Patrick Rowan YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLEMAN, LUCINDA F. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 052290 ORD: APLT MO GRNTD ONLY NOTE - 01 TO THE EXTENT THAT THE BRF NOTE - 02 SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30 DAYS FROM NOTE - 02 DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX
11/09/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BRIAN C. PLITT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD DSA
02/15/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD R
03/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (337-PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD RT
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02. PANELDDW SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD Q
07/03/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BA IN 10 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071390 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (ORDER J. KOTELLY 10/5/90) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991ORDER APLE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 081790 SCHPRD BE
02/19/1991FiledBriefing Completed
02/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022591 SCHPRD BE
05/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/14/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND FOR ORAL ARG RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1991ORDER DENY APLT'S REQUEST FOR ADDI- TIONAL BRIEFING & ORAL ARGU- MENT. MEH PANELROFEFA SCDATE 051491 SCHPRD VS
05/16/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGFEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/06/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD