Case Information: 44805 | |||
Short Caption: | CASTANEDA-RAMIREZ (HECTOR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44806 , 47531 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041896 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/03/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 05-04250 | |
03/21/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel Michael V. Roth shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. | 05-05425 | |
04/07/2005 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 3/28/05 appointing Charles Woodman as counsel for appellant. | 05-06892 | |
04/13/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time to Show Cause. | 05-07229 | |
04/27/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 13, 2005. Appellant's counsel Michael V. Roth shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the response. On March 28, 2005, the district court appointed Charles Woodman as appellate counsel for appellant. This court notes that the order appointing Woodman as appellate counsel does not relieve Roth of his obligation to file the response to this court's order to show cause, or of his obligations pursuant to NRAP 3C should this court determine that it has jurisdiction to entertain this appeal. | 05-08256 | |
06/01/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 05-10739 | |
07/06/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-13379 | |
08/02/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-13523 | |
08/02/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/12/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 3, 2005. | 05-13523 |