judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH PORTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0628
Short Caption:JOSEPH PORTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1421-86Filed Date:05/27/1987

Opening Event Date:05/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/17/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/27/1989
Argued/Submitted:06/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Porter N
Philip B. Ebersole NN
AppellantJoseph Porter N
Walter S. BoothYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Charles M. Steele YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PORTER, JOSEPH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/8/87 ORD:GRANT MO OF PHILIP NOTE - 01 B. EBERSOLE TO W/D & APPT NOTE - 02 WALTER S. BOOTH TO REPRESENT NOTE - 02 APLT FOR APPEAL; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL A STATE NOTE - 03 MENT IN 20 DAYS INDICATING NOTE - 04 WHETHER ADDT'L RT WILL BE NOTE - 04 ORDERED & PREPARED FOR APPEAL.
01/01/1906 EBERSOLEP VACATED 9/8/87.
05/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHILIP B. EBERSOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/28/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF (PHILIP B. EBERSOLE) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (122 PGS-MOLLICHELLI) TB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WALTER S. BOOTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD RT
09/17/1987STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD STATE
10/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (128 PGS - RONAN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1987ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/I 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER SL PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD CHECK
10/17/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 112487 SCHPRD BA
05/24/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 1/28 & 1/29/87 RT BY 6/15/88-ABSOLUTELY-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (164 PGS. -- WRAY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD RT
07/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 19, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 19, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/19/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD V
10/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 25TH JB DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 112588 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF 12/23/88. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
12/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 23, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 122388 SCHPRD BE
01/03/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME & FOR SUBMITTAL ON BRIEF AND/OR SUMMARY REVERSAL GT PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPA
01/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & CLK TO FL BE; CLK TO SCHED AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012489 SCHPRD X
06/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/13/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 561 A.2d 994
07/13/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 1490
08/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD