judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS M. HARLEY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0627
Short Caption:THOMAS M. HARLEY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10868-86Filed Date:05/26/1987

Opening Event Date:05/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/09/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/20/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas M. Harley, Jr.N
Leonard L. LongYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Glenn A. Fine YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARLEY JR., THOMAS M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/20 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LONGL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FINEG FOR - APPELLEE
05/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LEONARD L. LONG, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD CHECK
09/04/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
09/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
09/14/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD DSA
09/17/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (16 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/11/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 102787 SCHPRD BA
11/17/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/11/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD OPE
12/11/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 121187 SCHPRD BA
01/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/16/88 PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011587 SCHPRD BE
02/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (12 PGS TR - RONAN) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/09/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1988LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 6/20/88 DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD OPE
06/20/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/20/1988ARGUED PANELMKNWRG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKNWRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/13/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD