judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONEY VS. DIST. CT. (ALL STAR BAIL BONDS)

Case Information: 44821
Short Caption:MONEY VS. DIST. CT. (ALL STAR BAIL BONDS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43681 , 44819 , 45816
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A418980
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A468626
Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/08/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
03/08/2005Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Filed via fax.) 05-04496
03/08/2005MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion to Stay pending Consideration of Application for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. (Filed via fax.) 05-04497
03/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer and Granting Stay. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. We have considered petitioner's motion for a stay and conclude that a stay is warranted at this time. The trial in District Court Case No. A418980 is stayed pending our receipt and consideration of any response to the motion. 05-04624
03/09/2005Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. ORIGINAL - Application for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition - filed via fax 3/8/05. 05-04496
03/10/2005MotionFiled Motion. Plaintiffs/Real Parties in Interest All Star Bail Bonds, Inc.; Angela Mayfield; George Garcia and James L. Lyon's Emergency Motion for an Order Directing the Attorney General, on Behalf of Defendants, as Real Parties in Interest, to Comply with this Court's Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay and Motion to Allow Plaintiffs to File a Brief Concerning the Conflict Issues Raised in Petitioner's Petition - filed via fax. 05-04795
03/10/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Plaintiffs/Real Parties in Interest All Star Bail Bonds, Inc.; Angela Mayfield; George Garcia and James L. Lyon's Emergency Motion for an Order Directing the Attorney General, on Behalf of Defendants, as Real Parties in Interest, to Comply with this Court's Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay and Motion to Allow Plaintiffs to File a Brief Concerning the Conflict Issues Raised in Petitioner's Petition - filed via fax. 05-04815
03/10/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Curran & Parry - check no. 14245.
03/10/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Verification of Application for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition. 05-04823
03/10/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Verification of Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Consideration of Application for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition. 05-04824
03/11/2005MotionFiled Motion. ORIGINAL Plaintiffs/Real Parties in Interest All Star Bail Bonds, Inc.; Angela Mayfield; George Garcia and James L. Lyon's Emergency Motion for an Order Directing the Attorney General, on Behalf of Defendants, as Real Parties in Interest, to Comply with this Court's Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay and Motion to Allow Plaintiffs to File a Brief Concerning the Conflict Issues Raised in Petitioner's Petition filed via fax on 3/10/05. 05-04795
03/11/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Direct the Attorney General to File an Answer and Motion to Allow the Real Parties in Interest to File a Brief. These motions are premised on the real parties in interest's mistaken belief that this court intended to direct the defendants in the underlying case, who are currently represented by the attorney general's office, to file an answer. Petitioner did not name any of those defendants as real parties in interest to the instant petition; therefore they are not currently parties in this matter and were not directed to file an answer. . Accordingly, this court directed the named real parties in interest, All Star Bail Bonds, Inc., Angela Mayfield, George Garcia, and James Lyon to file an answer. If the real parties in interest support granting the relief sought by petitioner as their motions indicate, they are free to express that in their answer. Finally, we note that the failure of any party to file an answer will not delay the resolution of this petition. If no answer is received, this court will resolve the petition based solely on the documents submitted by petitioner. Accordingly, we deny the real parties in interest's motions. Additionally, we note that, should she so choose, respondent District Judge Valorie Vega is free to file an answer to this petition within the ten-day period. We also note that the other defendants may seek to intervene in this petition within the ten-day period if they so choose. 05-04891
03/18/2005Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Plaintiffs/Real Parties in Interest All Star Bail Bonds, Inc.; Angela Mayfield; George Garcia and James L. Lyon's Answer to Petitioner's Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. 05-05402
03/25/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Answer to Petition. 05-05830
04/25/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "We direct the court clerk to immediately issue a writ of mandamus compelling the district court to enter an order staying all proceedings in District Court Case No. A418980 until June 27, 2005." fn5[In light of this order, we vacate our March 8, 2005 stay of all district court proceedings.] SNP05-NB/RR/JH 05-08046
04/25/2005WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Joshua H. Reisman for service upon Judge Valorie Vega. 05-08086
05/02/2005WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Valorie J. Vega on April 28, 2005. 05-08086
05/20/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-08126
05/20/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.