judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM B. MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0666
Short Caption:WILLIAM B. MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9931-85Filed Date:05/29/1987

Opening Event Date:05/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/03/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/21/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam B. Moore N
Bruce M. Clarke YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Craig S. Iscoe YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOORE, WILLIAM B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/03/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - CLARKEB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ISCOEC FOR - APPELLEE
05/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
06/30/1987STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/03/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072887 SCHPRD R
08/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(462 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD RT
09/29/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 8, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
12/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 7, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/7/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD SL
01/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 21ST (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD BA
01/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD SL
02/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/23/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
03/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (5 PGS - DAVIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (26 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7 PGS - SWAGERTY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (9 PGS - RUST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/22/88 (NO OPA) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD BE
04/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (5 PGS - SANBORN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (19 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/21/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD BE
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (12 PGS - ALLISON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/3/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
10/31/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE, RESCHED CASE FROM 11/3/88 SUM CAL TO 11/18/88 AT 9:30 A.M. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD CSUM
11/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO PP ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/18/88 & CLK TO RESCHED ASAP. DAS PANELMKSTGA SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD VS
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL REPLY BRF. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 012689 SCHPRD VS
02/02/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/09/1989ARGUED PANELMKSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JDGMT HEREIN APPEALED PANELMKSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL PRIOR TO ISSUANCE OF MANDATE & SUGGESTION OF DEATH GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/28/1989ORDER CASE DISMISSED & REMANDED TO TRL CRT TO VACATE CONVIC DUE TO APLTS DEATH. DAS PANELMKSTGA SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD VS
04/28/1989DISP NO - 02 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
05/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD