Case Information: 44822 | |||
Short Caption: | KATHMAN VS. NELSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A463734 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/15/2005 / Holland Johnson, Susan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from George T. Bochanis, Ltd.--check no. 16036. | ||
03/08/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04503 | |
03/15/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/23/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-05669 | |
05/19/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney George Bochanis stating that the parties have reached an agreement. The settlement conference set for June 3, 2005 may be vacated. | 05-09868 | |
05/20/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 05-10009 | |
05/26/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 05-10387 | |
06/16/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. On May 26, 2005, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellant's notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 05-11818 | |
06/16/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |