judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN D. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0671
Short Caption:MARVIN D. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12132-86Filed Date:05/28/1987

Opening Event Date:05/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/12/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin D. Wilson N
Irwin A. Goldberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, MARVIN D. UNITED STATES
05/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) IRWIN GOLDBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD R
08/18/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD CHECK
10/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(191 PGS. -- BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
10/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD SL
01/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 012888 SCHPRD BE
05/12/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/12/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD