Case: 04-07-00150-CR
04-07-00150-CR
03/01/2007
Aggravated Robbery
Justin James Klein
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/21/2015 | Internal memo | | |
01/27/2010 | Case returned from higher court | | |
12/08/2009 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
07/18/2008 | Fee paid | | |
07/17/2008 | Letter filed | | |
07/08/2008 | Notice received | | |
06/30/2008 | Letter filed | | |
06/19/2008 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |
06/19/2008 | Mandate issued | | |
06/17/2008 | Email received | | |
03/19/2008 | Opinion withdrawn | | |
03/19/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/04/2008 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |
02/01/2008 | Letter filed | | |
01/18/2008 | Order entered | | |
01/18/2008 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/10/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/27/2007 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |
12/12/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/11/2007 | Submitted | | |
12/10/2007 | Letter filed | | |
11/07/2007 | Information regarding cause received | | |
10/26/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |
10/11/2007 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
10/11/2007 | Brief Filed | | |
10/11/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/21/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/20/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/27/2007 | Information regarding cause received | | |
08/21/2007 | Brief Filed | | |
07/05/2007 | Generate a formal court order | | |
07/05/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/02/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
05/31/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/31/2007 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/24/2007 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
03/26/2007 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
03/23/2007 | Mot. EOT to file reporter's record Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Filing is Noted by Court | |
03/22/2007 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
03/20/2007 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
03/01/2007 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
03/01/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/25/2007 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/19/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
06/19/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Klein, Justin | Criminal - Appellant | Jacob Bruce Henry Justin Klein |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Alison A. Fox |
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raymond Angelini
2005-CR-4458
25 years