judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRUCE E. DENT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0654
Short Caption:BRUCE E. DENT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 87-CF-0549 Consolidated: 87-CF-0632 , 87-CF-0654
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3619-86Filed Date:06/03/1987

Opening Event Date:06/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/30/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/17/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBruce E. Dent N
Roger C. Wesley YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Saul M. PilchenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DENT, BRUCE E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CAROLYN E. ADAMS, MARK NOTE - 01 A. CHAPPELL NOTE - 02 110987 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 02 TO CONSOLIDATE 87-549, 87-632 NOTE - 03 & 87-654; FO: CONSOLIDATED BR NOTE - 03 OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFTER BR NOTE - 04 OF APLT IS FILED IN 87-632. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 87-549 & 87-632 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 11/27/87 ORD - GRT APLT'S MO NOTE - 06 IN NO. 87-632 FOR LV TO FILE NOTE - 07 THE BRIEF; CLK DIRTD TO FILE NOTE - 07 THE LODGED APLT'S BRIEF IN NOTE - 08 NO. 87-632. FO THAT THE NOTE - 08 CONSOLIDATED BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 09 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS. NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PILCHENS FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 88/11/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HARTD FOR - APLT CHAPPELL ATTY 2 - SCAVUZZOS FOR - APLT ADAMS ATTY 3 - WESLEYR FOR - APPELLANT DENT
06/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD R
09/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (493 PGS - SWAGERTY) PB PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD RT
09/11/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JJ PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD OPE
11/09/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 111187 SCHPRD BE
11/10/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/17/87 IN 87-632 PB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
11/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-632 (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 87-632 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9 SL PANELPY SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD CHECK
12/28/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 29TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BE
01/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 29, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1988ORDER APLE'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEF 2/29/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD CHECK
02/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 14, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
03/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/14/88; ANXF. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD X
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (43 PGS - SWAGERTY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 24TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BE
03/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF (BRIEF NOT FILED --- ADS ONLY) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO SUBSTITUTE PAGE OF BRIEF JB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-632 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/17/1988ARGUED PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION...CAUSE RM FOR NEW TRIAL. PANELNWFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE
05/17/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1050
06/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD