Case Information: 44815 | |||
Short Caption: | AMERICAN VINYL COATINGS VS. DIST. CT. (SLAGLE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A496427 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Certiorari |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/07/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Paul V. Carelli III--check no. 4955. | ||
03/07/2005 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. | 05-04404 | |
03/08/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/22/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Paul V. Carelli, III in Support of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. | 05-05550 | |
04/25/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Certiorari. "We deny the petition." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-07991 | |
05/20/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 05-08125 | |
05/20/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |