judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM J. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1351
Short Caption:WILLIAM J. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2030-89Filed Date:11/15/1989

Opening Event Date:11/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/02/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/29/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/30/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam J. Davis N
Janell M. Wolfe YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Wanda G. Bryant YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, WILLIAM J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/30/90 ORD: SHOULD NOT BE NOTE - 01 CONSIDERED ON THE RECORD ON NOTE - 02 APPEAL & APLT'S BRIEF ALONE. NOTE - 02
11/15/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JANELL M. WOLFE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD DSA
01/30/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (22 PGS. -- EDLEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011490 SCHPRD R
02/02/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990ORDER APPELLEE TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS APPEAL (SEE NOTES 1 & 2) JB PANELRO SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BE
06/29/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/29/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062990 SCHPRD BE
10/30/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/30/1990SUBMITTED PANELBESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990VACATED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART ORDER VACATING TRIAL COURT SENTENCE...CAUSE RM FOR RECON SIDERATION PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - VARM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD