Case Information: 44825 | |||
Short Caption: | SILVAR (LANI) VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C198746 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 10/19/2005 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 02/03/2006 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/08/2005 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. | 05-04612 | |
03/08/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits. | 05-04613 | |
03/08/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | ||
03/10/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file on behalf of the respondents an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. The State shall obtain and include with its answer a certified copy of a written order of the district court setting forth the district court's reasoning respecting the constitutional question at issue and resolving the State's appeal from the justice's court proceedings. | 05-04801 | |
03/14/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appendix of Exhibits and Petition. | 05-05024 | |
04/11/2005 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Defendant's Petition for Writ of Certiorari. | 05-07094 | |
04/11/2005 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on April 6, 2005. | 05-07095 | |
04/11/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: August 18, 2004. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. | 05-07096 | |
09/01/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 19, 2005, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP06R-MD/RR/RP) | ||
10/05/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
10/19/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06-MD/RR/RP | ||
02/03/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order for En Banc Consideration and Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter was held on October 19, 2005, before the Northern Nevada Panel. Upon further review, we have determined that en banc consideration of this appeal is warranted. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision without further argument to the En Banc Court as of the date of this order. | 06-02497 | |
02/03/2006 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. To the En Banc Court. | ||
03/16/2006 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk to issue a writ of certiorari. Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Rose, C.J, Becker, Maupin, Gibbons, Douglas, Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. EN BANC. | 06-05642 | |
03/16/2006 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Susan D. Burke for service upon Senior Judge John S. McGroarty. | 06-05644 | |
03/27/2006 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge McGroarty and Judge Bell on March 21, 2006. | 06-05644 | |
04/11/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 06-06026 | |
04/11/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on page 5 and 8 of the original opinion filed on March 16, 2006. |