judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD BLAKE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0631
Short Caption:RONALD BLAKE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12021-86Filed Date:05/21/1987

Opening Event Date:05/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/13/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/16/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Blake N
Joseph R. Conte YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William M. Blier YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLAKE, RONALD UNITED STATES
05/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH R. CONTE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (179 PGS - SCHOCH) PB PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD RT
08/28/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/8/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 100787 SCHPRD BA
11/09/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 13, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BE
01/13/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/13/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 011388 SCHPRD BE
05/16/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/16/1988SUBMITTED PANELFERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/10/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD