judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BARRION L. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0630
Short Caption:BARRION L. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5367-85Filed Date:05/20/1987

Opening Event Date:05/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/13/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBarrion L. Brown N
W. Douglas WhamNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, BARRION L. BROWN, ANA BARRION UNITED STATES
05/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) W. DOUGLAS WHAM, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
02/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (154 PGS TR - DAVIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD RT
03/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 25TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BA
04/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BA
04/20/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO W/D CASE AND CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD V
04/20/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
05/13/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD