judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES J. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES.

Case Information: 87-CF-0563
Short Caption:JAMES J. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES.Classification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0563Consolidated: 87-CF-0660
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9887-86Filed Date:05/15/1987

Opening Event Date:05/15/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/08/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames J. Young N
Clark U. Fleckinger, IIYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven W. Pelak YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YOUNG, JAMES J. UNITED STATES.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: THOMAS BARTLEY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 87-660 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 081088 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 03 TO CONS 870563 & 87-660; FO: NOTE - 04 APLT BR IN 87-563 DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 04 AFT RT & CON BR OF APLE DUE 30 NOTE - 05 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 05
05/15/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 071487 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CLARK U. FLECKINGER, II, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/05/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS PB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE DSA, CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD OPE
04/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 *529 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 6TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
07/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER FILING OF TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070688 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070788 SCHPRD M
08/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(26 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD RT
12/20/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 3, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD BA
02/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/3/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD BA
04/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 8, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD BE
04/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/8/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD V
05/08/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BE
11/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1989SUBMITTED RJG PANELNWSWMK SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD CSUM
11/08/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELNWSWMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE RJG
11/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD