judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENNIS R. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0562
Short Caption:DENNIS R. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4154-86Filed Date:05/19/1987

Opening Event Date:05/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/03/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/12/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/06/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDennis R. Robinson N
Craig Dean Katz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Glenn A. Fine NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, DENNIS R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RONALD D. COOK & NOTE - 01 SHERMAN BROWN
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/04/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KATZC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FINEG FOR - APPELLEE
05/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CRAIG DEAN KATZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/03/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 100287 SCHPRD BA
10/01/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/4/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BE
10/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (7 PGS - PIRFO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS - ARTIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 110487 SCHPRD BE
11/05/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(6 PGS. -- PAVLISH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988LETTER LETTER GRANTING REQ OF ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 4/12/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 032188 SCHPRD OPE
04/12/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/12/1988ARGUED PANELPYNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON APPEAL PANELPYNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD