judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

J.B. JETT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1362
Short Caption:J.B. JETT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6554-88Filed Date:11/17/1989

Opening Event Date:11/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/13/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/25/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJ.B. Jett N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Norman C. Bay YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JETT, J.B. UNITED STATES
11/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD DSA
02/06/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSCRIPT 143-PGS/PIRFO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD R
02/13/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/13/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 1, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD BA
04/04/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR AN EXT OF TM TO FL BRIEF TO 5/1/90. NFX JJ PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD B
05/01/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050190 SCHPRD BA
05/31/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 29, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD BE
06/07/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/25/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; APPEAL SCHDED BEF A MERIT DIV AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD B
03/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD