Case Information: 44828 | |||
Short Caption: | MENDOZA (JESSIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204371 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C201105 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/08/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04622 | |
03/08/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/27/04, 11/9/04 and 11/10/04. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. Filed in district court on: March 3, 2005. | 05-04623 | |
04/11/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/9/04 and 11/10/04. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | 05-07110 | |
04/18/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-07471 | |
05/09/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 18, 2005. Court reporter or recorder JoAnn Orduna shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 05-09003 | |
06/09/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The rough draft transcript requests were filed in the district court on March 3, 2005, and the requested transcripts are overdue. Court reporter or recorder JoAnn Orduna shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file the requested transcript. | 05-11402 | |
07/12/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Court reporter JoAnn Orduna shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the transcript conducted on October 27, 2004, or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. | 05-13757 | |
07/13/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: Wednesday, October 27, 2004, 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | 05-13971 | |
08/12/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-16020 | |
09/01/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Mendoza's Motion for Leave to File a 19-Page Fast Track Statement. | 05-17318 | |
09/08/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed September 1, 2005. The clerk of this court shall file the 19-page fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on September 1, 2005. | 05-17773 | |
09/08/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-17319 | |
09/08/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-17320 | |
09/29/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-19389 | |
03/16/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn8[We decline to grant Mendoza permission to file documents in proper person. The clerk shall return to Mendoza unfiled all proper person documents he has submitted to this court.] NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-05679 | |
03/16/2006 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Motion for Appointment of Appeal Counsel received on August 4, 2005 to appellant Jessie Gonzales Mendoza. | ||
04/11/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-06048 | |
04/11/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/20/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 13, 2006. | 06-06048 |