judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN C. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0593
Short Caption:MARVIN C. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 86-CF-1690 Consolidated:87-CF-0593
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2140-85Filed Date:03/25/1987

Opening Event Date:03/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/11/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin C. Williams N
Lisa E. Greenman YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, MARVIN C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 111887 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED NOTE - 02 W/THIS CT; FO: CT RPTR ROBERT NOTE - 03 BRADLEY, W/IN 10 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 03 EST COMP DATE OF RT. NOTE - 04 012088 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 04 TO CONS 86-1690 & 87-593; FO: NOTE - 05 CT RPTR BRADLEY TO FILE HIS NOTE - 05 PORTION OF RT IN 87-593 W/IN NOTE - 06 30 DAYS-ABSOLUTELY-NFX; FO: NOTE - 06 APLT BR IN 87-593 DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 07 THEREAFTER & CONS BR OF APLE NOTE - 07 DUE 30 DAYS AFTER APLT BR. NOTE - 08 CON 86-1690 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 020188 ORDER: 1/20/88 ORDER NOTE - 09 VACATED IN THAT COURT DIR CT. NOTE - 10 RPTR. BRADLEY TO FILE HIS POR- NOTE - 10 TION OF RT W/IN 30 DAYS; FO: NOTE - 11 APLT BR IN 87-593 DUE IN 40 NOTE - 11 DAYS & CONS BR OF APLE DUE 30 NOTE - 12 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 3/25/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 13 NO. 87-593 TO FILE BRF ON OR NOTE - 14 BEFORE 4/14/88 (NFX). FO THAT NOTE - 14 CONSOLIDATED BRF OF APLE SHALL NOTE - 15 BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS NOTE - 15 THEREAFTER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - NUNNK FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - TOURISHT FOR - APPELLEE
03/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (121 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (2,290 PGS - BURNS)(4 VOLS) (SEE 86-1690 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (22 PGS - RHOADES)(SEE 86-1690 FOR RT) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (19 PGS - RHOADES)(SEE 86-1690 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (781 PGS - TOOBY)(SEE 86-1690 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 VOL. I, II & III (1,117 PGS - HART) PB PANEL SCDATE 070287 SCHPRD RT
10/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD BA
11/18/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 111087 SCHPRD OPE
01/20/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD STATE
01/29/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM CT RPTR BRADLEY RE: 5/13 & 5/14/86 RT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09 - 12. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021988 SCHPRD RT
03/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 14, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BA
03/25/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13 THRU 15 SL PANELPY SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD N
04/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 14TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD BA
04/25/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/13/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041988 SCHPRD X
05/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 12, 1988 CWC PANEL SCDATE 051388 SCHPRD BA
05/20/1988ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 12, 1988; ANFX. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061288 SCHPRD BA
06/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD CHECK
07/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/16/88 (NO OPA) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD BE
09/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD BE
10/06/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/17/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD V
10/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 16TH JB PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BE
10/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(113 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/16/88; ANFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD CHECK
11/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 111688 SCHPRD BE
11/21/1988APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES (NO OPPO) JB PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989LETTER DATED 2-24-89 OF APPELLEE PURSUANT TO RULE 28 (K) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 2/28/89 CITATION TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989RECEIVED LETTER FRM APLT'S COUNSEL REQ. PERMISSION TO CONCEDE TIME AL- LOTED FOR ORAL ARG. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1989CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 (APPELLEE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/13/1989ARGUED PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON MERITS/ CAUSE RM w/DIRECTIONS TO VA CERTAIN CONVICTIONS PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/11/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 6/20/89 (#88-7546) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN U.S. SUPREME COURT ON 10-2-89 #88-7546 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD