judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN P. BRIGGMON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1380
Short Caption:CALVIN P. BRIGGMON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1139-89Filed Date:11/20/1989

Opening Event Date:11/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/30/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/03/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/04/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/27/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCalvin P. Briggmon N
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRIGGMON, CALVIN P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/12/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 10/29/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 02 BY 12/3/90; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 12/24/90; SCHD CASE ON FEB. NOTE - 03 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03
11/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL L. SPEKTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD DSA
02/15/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 011990 SCHPRD R
02/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(139 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD RT
05/30/1990FiledRecord Completed
05/30/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(6 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD RT
09/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD B
10/29/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD BA
12/03/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/03/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120390 SCHPRD BE
02/04/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/04/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEBEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELFEBEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/27/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD