Case Information: 44831 | |||
Short Caption: | BLACKBURN (DEWAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44894 , 49944 , 53153 , 54938 , 54941 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C198919 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/08/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04631 | |
04/06/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-06736 | |
04/13/2005 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 30, 2004, December 1, 2004, December 2, 2004 and December 3, 2004. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. | 05-07257 | |
04/14/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/30/04 through 12/03/04. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. Filed in district court on: 04/08/05. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. | 05-07332 | |
04/15/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Amended Request for Rough Draft Transcript. Transcripts requested: 11/30/04 through 12/03/04. Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. Filed in district court on: 04/11/05. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. | 05-07407 | |
04/15/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 6, 2005. Appellant's counsel Jason L. Earnest shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 05-07410 | |
04/22/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of transcripts to opposing counsel. | 05-07956 | |
05/09/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-09032 | |
05/17/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Counsel informs this court that an extension is necessary because counsel has been working on other cases. Counsel's caseload is not sufficient to demonstrate extreme need or merit. The motion is therefore denied. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 05-09543 | |
06/06/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-11077 | |
06/06/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-11078 | |
06/30/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 13 pages. | 05-13026 | |
06/30/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-13027 | |
06/30/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 05-13028 | |
01/19/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn5[The clerk shall return to appellant unfiled all proper person documents appellant has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-01455 | |
01/19/2006 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Letter re: Sixth Amendment Rights received June 21, 2005. | ||
02/14/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-01909 | |
02/14/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/02/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 16, 2006. | 06-01909 |