Case Information: 40944 | |||
Short Caption: | BRAUNER VS. HARRIS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A422891 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/28/2003 / Kaufman, Jerry | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/14/2003 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
02/14/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Barry Levinson--check no. 1650. | ||
02/14/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-02634 | |
02/28/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/19/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 03-04649 | |
03/19/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. --Certificate of Mailing of Docketing Statement. | 03-04651 | |
03/20/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed March 19, 2003. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on March 12, 2003. | 03-04797 | |
03/20/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-04132 | |
03/21/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman. (docketing statement) | ||
04/17/2003 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 03-06538 | |
04/17/2003 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 03-06539 | |
04/17/2003 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 03-06600 | |
04/28/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 03-07102 | |
04/28/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |