judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES G. ROSS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0585
Short Caption:CHARLES G. ROSS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9439-85Filed Date:05/07/1987

Opening Event Date:05/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/10/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles G. Ross N
Richard Huber YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kathleen Brandon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROSS, CHARLES G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 012088 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT ONLY TO EXTENT THAT NOTE - 02 APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT NOTE - 02 IS FILED W/THIS COURT; FO: IN NOTE - 03 20 DAYS APT TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 03 EST COMPLETION DATE OF RT.
05/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD HUBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/23/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (144 PGS. - SALAZAR) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR EXT & CLK TO FL LODGED DSA; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080487 SCHPRD OPE
09/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 30TH (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 30, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD M
03/30/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/1-20-88 ORD OR VACATE APNTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD STATE
04/11/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 3/30/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD STATE
08/10/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO COMPLETE & FILE 2/17-2/19/87 RT W/IN 30 DAYS - ABSO-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
08/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (290 PGS RT - MITCHELL) GT PANEL SCDATE 090988 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR-ANFX-OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
11/10/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 111088 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/17/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BE
12/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/17/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD V
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD BE
02/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/16/89; NFX, DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD N
02/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD BE
03/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/20/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD Q
03/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PB PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/10/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELFEBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE RJG
11/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD