Case Information: 40945 | |||
Short Caption: | STOVALL VS. STATE BAR OF NEVADA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2003 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 03-02655 | |
02/18/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay of Disciplinary Proceeding pursuant to NRAP 8(c). | 03-02656 | |
02/18/2003 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibits in Support of the Emergency Motion for Stay of Disciplinary Proceedings, and Exhibits in Support of Petitioner's Writ of Mandamus. | 03-02672 | |
02/20/2003 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Emergency Motion for Stay of Disciplinary Proceeding Pursuant to NAP 8(C) and Exhibits in Support of the Emergency Motion for Stay of Disciplinary Proceeding and Exhibits in Support of Petitioner's Writ of Mandamus. | 03-02867 | |
02/20/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed Februry 18, 2003. We grant the motion and stay the State Bar's disciplinary proceedings in Case No. 02-005-0022, pending resolution of this writ petition. Respondent shall have 30 days from this order's date to file an answer, including authorities, against the writ's issuance. | 03-02890 | |
03/26/2003 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 03-05108 | |
04/15/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 03-06411 | |
04/28/2003 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Strike and Nonopposition to Petitioner's Motion for Order Allowing Reply Brief. | 03-07126 | |
11/10/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to Strike, Directing Amended Answer and Granting Motion to file Reply. Petitioner has filed a motion to strike the answer, or alternatively, to be permitted to file a reply. Respondents oppose the motion to strike, but do not oppose the request to file a reply. We deny the motion to strike. We conclude that our review of this matter would be assisted by respondents' citation to the exhibits on file in this matter for the factual assertions in their answer. Respondents shall have 20 days from this order's date to file an amended answer with citations to the exhibits filed by either petitioner or respondents. We grant petitioner's request to file a reply. Petitioner shall have 20 days from service of the amended answer to file any reply. | 03-18729 | |
12/02/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time to Comply with Court's November 10, 2003 Order. | 03-20008 | |
12/16/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed December 2, 2003. Respondent shall have until December 30, 2003, to file and serve its amended answer. Petitioner shall have 20 days from service of the amended answer to file any reply. Further, petitioner shall immediately inform this court if the hearing panel accepts the conditional plea and reinstatement agreement. | 03-20923 | |
12/31/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Joint Motion to Enlarge Time to Comply with Court's November 10, 2003 Order and to Lift Stay in Disciplinary Proceedings (Second Request). | 03-21706 | |
01/08/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Extension and to Lift Stay of Disciplinary Proceedings. We grant the motion in all respects. We vacate our February 20, 2003 stay order for the purpose of permitting the January 14, 2004, hearing to proceed. Also, respondents shall have until January 30, 2004, within which to file an amended answer. Alternatively, if the hearing panel approves the parties' plea agreement and this matter becomes moot, then respondents shall so inform this court by January 30, 2004. | 04-00431 | |
01/27/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Panel Recommendation to Approve Plea Memorandum and Reinstate Petitioner. | 04-01706 | |
02/17/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Supplemental Notice of Panel Recommendation to Approve Plea Memorandum and Reinstate Petitioner. | 04-02938 | |
03/26/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Petition. Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. This original petition for a writ of mandamus challenges several decisions by the Southern Nevada Disciplinary Board chair. The parties have reached a stipulated resolution in the underlying case, and have agreed to dismiss the petition. 'We dismiss this petition.' SNP04S-MS/RR/WM | 04-05687 | |
03/26/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued. |