judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARTHUR A. CONNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0634
Short Caption:ARTHUR A. CONNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10381-86Filed Date:06/02/1987

Opening Event Date:06/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArthur A. Conner N
Joseph R. Conte YN
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CONNER, ARTHUR A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 TRANSCRIPT MLH NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 120887 ORDER: DENY APLT REQ NOTE - 02 FOR SUP VOUCHER FOR RT W/OUT NOTE - 03 PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL BE- NOTE - 03 FORE THE TR CT FOR ITS CONS IN NOTE - 04 THE 1ST INSTANCE; FO: GRANT NOTE - 04 APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR NOTE - 05 ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT COUNS NOTE - 05 FOR APLT W/IN 10 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 06 AN APPROPRIATE MO FOR PRODUC- NOTE - 06 TION OF RT W/THE TR CT & SERVE NOTE - 07 A COPY THEREOF W/THE CLK OF NOTE - 07 THIS CT.
06/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH R. CONTE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD R
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (147 PGS - MOLLICHELLI) PB PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
10/16/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED & FOR SUP- PLEMENTAL VOUCHER FOR (NOTE 1) PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD BA
12/08/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD EBP
12/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD EBP
02/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (58 PGS TR - MOLLICHELLI)GT PANEL SCDATE 040188 SCHPRD RT
02/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
02/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BA
04/25/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 27, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BE
05/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 28, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD BE
05/27/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 6/28/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 052588 SCHPRD V
06/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/6/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 062888 SCHPRD BE
07/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
07/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/14/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD