Case Information: 44809 | |||
Short Caption: | NISGORE VS. RALPHS GROCERY CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A438881 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Parraguirre | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/09/2005 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/04/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Blalock & Qualey--check no. 65612. | ||
03/04/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04293 | |
03/09/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/28/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Docketing Statement). | ||
04/12/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. | 05-07170 | |
04/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 05-07940 | |
05/12/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Order of Remand and Dismissing Appeal. We elect to treat appellant's notice as a motion for remand and voluntary dismissal of this appeal and the district court's order granting appellant's motion for reconsideration as a certification that it is inclined to grant the requested relief upon remand pursuant to Huneycutt. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion. "This matter is remanded to the district court and this appeal is dismissed." SNP05-RR/MG/JH | 05-09284 | |
05/12/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |