judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY M. QUIGLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0633
Short Caption:GREGORY M. QUIGLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10186-86Filed Date:06/01/1987

Opening Event Date:06/01/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/09/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/19/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/20/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory M. Quigley N
William L. Peters YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Ronald C. Crump YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901QUIGLEY, GREGORY M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHAEL L. FORD NOTE - 01
06/01/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD CHECK
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD R
07/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (381 PGS - DAVIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD RT
08/09/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (5 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 092088 SCHPRD BA
10/20/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 102088 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/25/88 (NO OPA) PB GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BE
12/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 122288 SCHPRD BE
01/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 24, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD OPA
09/19/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/19/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/20/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD