Case Information: 44808 | |||
Short Caption: | WEDDELL VS. DIST. CT. (WEDDELL) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43733 , 44516 , 45312 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0301244G | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Allison W. Joffee--check no. 9038. | ||
03/04/2005 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 05-04270 | |
04/18/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Motion for Immediate Stay of Lower Court Proceedings. | 05-07450 | |
04/28/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Motion for Immediate Stay of Lower Court Proceedings. | 05-08416 | |
05/03/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Addendum to Response to Motion for Immediate Stay of Lower Court Proceedings. | 05-08708 | |
05/09/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File a Reply regarding Motion for Immediate Stay of Lower Court Proceedings. | 05-09073 | |
05/19/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "We deny the petition." fn5[In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioner's motion for stay.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-09823 | |
06/06/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
06/06/2005 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 05-11072 | |
06/06/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150.00 from Allison W. Joffee for Rehearing. | ||
07/06/2005 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-13282 | |
08/02/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 05-13502 | |
08/02/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |