Case Information: 44800 | |||
Short Caption: | HUBER (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 63524 , 63922 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C198448 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/31/2005 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/03/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04244 | |
03/14/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-05020 | |
03/22/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from filed on 3/2/05. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/25/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | ||
03/28/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of judgment of conviction filed in district court on March 2, 2005. | 05-05994 | |
03/31/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on March 2, 2005. | 05-06336 | |
04/04/2005 | Other | Other. Filed copy of Order to Prepare Transcripts for Trial: filed in district court on 03/30/05. | 05-06620 | |
04/08/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 10, 11, 12, and 13, 2005. To Court Reporter: Cindy Magnussen. | 05-06938 | |
07/19/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | ||
08/08/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-15634 | |
08/08/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 05-15635 | |
09/07/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 05-17705 | |
09/08/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Transcripts. On April 8, 2005, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting court reporter Cindy Magnussen to produce transcripts. Our review of the district court minute entries indicates that Peggy Isom was the court reporter for those proceedings. Accordingly, Ms. Magnussen is not obligated to prepare transcripts for these dates. Ms. Isom shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcripts for proceedings held on January 10, 2005, January 11, 2005, January 12, 2005, and January 13, 2005. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attahced to this order.] | 05-17736 | |
09/15/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 01/11/04; 01/12/04; 01/13/04; 01/10/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. | 05-18380 | |
10/17/2005 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
10/31/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 05-21387 | |
10/31/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/12/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-00919 | |
02/07/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-01404 | |
02/07/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/02/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2006. | 06-01404 |