judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH COLEMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0665
Short Caption:JOSEPH COLEMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10208-86Filed Date:05/29/1987

Opening Event Date:05/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Coleman N
Charles F. Stow NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLEMAN, JOSEPH UNITED STATES
05/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES F. STOW, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 072887 SCHPRD R
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
02/07/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE RT (NAME OF RPTR, DATE ORDERED, EST. DATE) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE DIXON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 2/7/89 TO 3/3/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD STATE
03/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ANSWER TO ORDER 2-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (245 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD RT
07/03/1989ORDER APLT BR TO BE FILED IN 20 DAYS OR APPEAL MAY BE DISMISSED. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 062089 SCHPRD BA
07/26/1989ORDER PROCEED STAYED PROVIDED APLT IN 10 DAYS FL COPY OF 23-110 MO FL IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD BA
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPEAL PENDING RULING ON MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF SENTENCE IN LOWER CT GT PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD ANSA
09/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR STAY & COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN 5 AS TO STATUS OF PENDG TRL MO. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD Q
09/12/1989STATEMENT RE STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TRIAL COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD STATE
11/28/1989STATEMENT TO SUP. CT. MOTION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (JUDGE DIXON 11/21/89 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT DUE IN 40 DAYS. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD K
03/09/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 5 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT MAY BE REFERRED TO BPR. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD K
04/09/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE APPROPRIATE PLEADINGS TO APRIL 12, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR EXT. TO FILE APPROPRIATE PLEADING TO WITH- DRAW APPEAL TO 4/25/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXTEND TIME TO 5-14 -90 TO SUMBIT MOTION AND AFF. TO WITHDRAW HIS APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/15/1990ORDER APLT MO GRNTD AND APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED PANELJWR SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD GR
10/15/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
11/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD