Case Information: 40949 | |||
Short Caption: | MARCHBANK, JR. (FRED) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44442 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011139 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/25/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 03-02709 | |
02/19/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal. Upon further review, it has been determined that this is not a fast track appeal. | ||
03/12/2003 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/11/03. | 03-04193 | |
03/12/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 03-04199 | |
03/26/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response from attorney Bruce Voorhees due: 20 days from the date of this order. Mr. Voorhees shall investigate and inquire of prison officials if there is any documentation in establishing: (1) whether appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official for mailing; and (2) if so, the date upon which appellant delivered the notice of appeal to the official for mailing. This court suspends the briefing schedule pending further order of this court. | 03-05091 | |
04/14/2003 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 03-06363 | |
05/13/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. On April 14, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a response to this court's order. Having considered the documents before this court and the response of appellant's counsel, this court concludes that this appeal may proceed. We reinstate the briefing schedule in this appeal. The State shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall file and serve the reply brief, if any, within 30 days from the date of service of the answering brief. | 03-08119 | |
05/13/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 12, 2003, appellant filed a proper person notice of appeal and docketed in this court on February 18, 2003. On March 12, 2003, this court filed an opening brief and appendix submitted on appellant's behalf by attorney Bruce D. Voorhees. We elect to treat the fling of the opening brief as a notice of appearance as counsel of record. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate that he will not be requesting the preparation of transcripts. | 03-08164 | |
05/21/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 03-08567 | |
06/13/2003 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 03-09876 | |
07/25/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
01/05/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04-RR/DA/WM | 04-00227 | |
01/30/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-00408 | |
01/30/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/09/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 2, 2004. | 04-00408 |