Case: 01-06-00329-CR
01-06-00329-CR
04/13/2006
Aggravated assault
George Kelly Morris
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2006 | Mandate issued | | |||||
12/07/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
12/07/2006 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
12/07/2006 | Case reinstated | | |||||
12/07/2006 | Hearing record due | | |||||
12/06/2006 | Submitted | | |||||
11/20/2006 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/20/2006 | Motion to withdraw appeal filed | | |||||
11/09/2006 | Order issued | Abate case | | ||||
09/10/2006 | Brief Due | | |||||
09/01/2006 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order | | ||||
07/19/2006 | Brief Due | | |||||
06/28/2006 | Reporters Record Due (Statement of Facts) | | |||||
06/19/2006 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||||
06/06/2006 | Request for time to file reporter's record disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
06/02/2006 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||||
05/30/2006 | Request filed for additional time to file reporter's record | | |||||
05/28/2006 | Record due 60 days after sentence imposed or suspended in open court or order appealed signed (TRAP 35.2(a)) | | |||||
04/13/2006 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||||
03/31/2006 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||||
03/29/2006 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/11/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Morris, George Kelly | Appellant | Gary Bunyard |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Michael R. Little |
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Chambers
Honorable I I I Chap B. Cain
13039
20 yrs. TDC