judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEONARD C. HYATER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0583
Short Caption:LEONARD C. HYATER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6996-86Filed Date:04/24/1987

Opening Event Date:04/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/15/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeonard C. Hyater N
Joel F. Brenner NN
AppellantLeonard C. Hyater N
Robert O. Goff YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Schornstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HYATER, LEONARD C. UNITED STATES
04/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/15/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/15/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 062387 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOEL F. BRENNER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
08/05/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT O. GOFF, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD DSA
12/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(14 PGS. -- SALAZAR) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (404 PGS - SIMMS) PB PANEL SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD RT
07/28/1988ORDER GRANT CT RPTR'S REQ FOR EXT TO 9/1/88 TO FILE 2/5/87 RT - ANFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD RT
09/20/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 2/5/87 RT FROM CT RPTR WATKINS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD BA
11/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD BE
12/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 3, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010589 SCHPRD BE
01/26/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/3/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPA
02/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/13/89 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 020389 SCHPRD BE
02/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD V
07/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/07/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: CONVICTIONS ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1990LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT REFERRING LTR FROM APLT DATED 10/18/90 SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990RECEIVED LTR FROM COUNSEL FOR APLT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD