judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLAUDIETTE TENNY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0582
Short Caption:CLAUDIETTE TENNY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8569-86Filed Date:05/08/1987

Opening Event Date:05/08/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/07/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/12/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClaudiette Tenny N
Stephen O. Russell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William M. Blier YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TENNY, CLAUDIETTE UNITED STATES
05/08/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (IN CLKS FILE BUT NOT ON ADS UNTIL 9/87.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN O. RUSSELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 070787 SCHPRD R
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (317 PGS. - SWAGERTY) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE IN 10 DAYS; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS EBP PANELMK SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
08/28/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO FILE DSA. (VACATED 9/15/87) EBP PANELBE SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1987ORDER VACATING 8/28 ORDER: GRANTING APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 10/30/87. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD STATE
10/30/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD BA
11/24/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/7/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 120487 SCHPRD BE
01/07/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/07/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD BE
05/12/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/12/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD