Case: 05-06-00544-CV
05-06-00544-CV
04/14/2006
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Brown, Mark Edward
O Forclosure
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/02/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/31/2006 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
08/01/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
08/01/2006 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
08/01/2006 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
08/01/2006 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
07/31/2006 | Submission | | |
07/31/2006 | Submitted | | |
07/21/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
07/06/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
07/06/2006 | Notice to Party's that Clerk's Record Not Paid | | |
06/27/2006 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
06/27/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
06/27/2006 | Notice to Party's that Clerk's Record Not Paid | | |
06/12/2006 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |
06/12/2006 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |
06/05/2006 | Record due | | |
06/02/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
05/04/2006 | Letter Filed | | |
05/02/2006 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
05/01/2006 | Affidavit Filed | | |
04/27/2006 | Order Entered | Sustained | |
04/20/2006 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
04/19/2006 | Contest to an affidavit of inability to pay, filed in COA | | |
04/14/2006 | Affidavit Filed | | |
04/14/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/14/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/14/2006 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/06/2006 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/01/2012 | Status | Destroy record |
11/02/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
O Forclosure | Appellee | Ms. Jennine Hovell-cox |
Mark Edward Brown | Appellant | Mark Edward Brown |
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John B Peyton
06-01649